04/21/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2009. | |||
04/21/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. | |||
04/16/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
04/16/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 520.) | |||
03/31/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/26/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 678.) | |||
03/23/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 23). | |||
03/11/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
03/10/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Amended. | |||
02/23/2009 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
02/04/2009 | From printer. | |||
02/03/2009 | Introduced. To print. |