California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR180 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/16/2010

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 180CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 169 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 16, 2010 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 31, 2010 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 17, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Beall AUGUST 2, 2010 Relative to Alcohol and Drug Addiction Recovery Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 180, Beall. Alcohol and Drug Addiction Recovery Month. This measure would recognize September 2010 as Alcohol and Drug Addiction Recovery Month in California, in order to raise awareness of the importance of substance use disorders treatment and to help those suffering from substance use disorders and their families to receive treatment. WHEREAS, Substance use disorders impact 3.4 million people, 12 years of age or older, in California, or approximately 9.5 percent of the population. Alcohol abuse or dependence is more common than abuse or dependence on any other drug; and WHEREAS, Studies have consistently found that individualized treatment is essential for people to be successful in their path of recovery; and WHEREAS, Treatment and long-term recovery from substance use disorders can offer a renewed outlook on life for those who are addicted, and their family members; and WHEREAS, People who receive treatment for substance use disorders can lead more productive and fulfilling lives, both personally and professionally; and WHEREAS, Real stories of long-term recovery can inspire others to ask for help and improve their own lives, the lives of their families, and the entire community; and WHEREAS, The theme of this year's effort, "Join the Voices for Recovery: Now More Than Ever," recognizes the impact that real people and real stories have on recovery and celebrates those who have worked to advance the treatment and recovery landscape; and WHEREAS, It is critical that we educate our community members that substance use disorders are treatable, yet serious, health care problems, and by treating them like other chronic diseases, we can improve the quality of life for the entire community; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the month of September 2010 as Alcohol and Drug Addiction Recovery Month, in order to raise awareness of the importance of substance use disorder treatment, and to help those suffering from substance use disorders and their families to receive treatment; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature encourages public support for "Join the Voices for Recovery: Now More Than Ever" events planned in their community during the 2010 Alcohol and Drug Addiction Recovery Month; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.