09/14/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 163, Statutes of 2010. | |||
09/14/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | |||
08/30/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/27/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4977.) | |||
08/25/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/17/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
08/17/2010 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6289.) | |||
08/16/2010 | Amended. To third reading. | |||
08/12/2010 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 12). | |||
08/04/2010 | Introduced. To print. |