09/16/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 172, Statutes of 2010. | |||
09/16/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:15 p.m. | |||
09/01/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
09/01/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5121.) | |||
08/31/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |||
08/30/2010 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6867.) | |||
08/26/2010 | Referred to Com. on RULES. From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (August 26). | |||
08/19/2010 | From printer. | |||
08/18/2010 | Introduced. To print. |