|
07/17/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 75, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
07/17/2009
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1667.)
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1467.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (May 6).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
12/02/2008
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
12/01/2008
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|