04/01/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 11, Statutes of 2009. | |||
04/01/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:15 p.m. | |||
03/26/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
03/26/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 353.) | |||
03/03/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/02/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 487.) | |||
02/26/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 26). | |||
02/23/2009 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
02/11/2009 | From printer. | |||
02/10/2009 | Introduced. To print. |