07/02/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 62, Statutes of 2009. | |||
07/02/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
06/26/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
06/26/2009 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1492.) | |||
06/25/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |||
03/02/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/26/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 401.) | |||
02/14/2009 | Referred to Com. on RULES. From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (February 14). | |||
02/12/2009 | From printer. | |||
02/11/2009 | Introduced. To print. |