06/03/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 44, Statutes of 2009. | |||
06/03/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
06/01/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
06/01/2009 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1105.) | |||
04/16/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |||
04/13/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/02/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 753.) | |||
03/17/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) . | |||
02/23/2009 | Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T. & I.M. | |||
02/19/2009 | From printer. | |||
02/18/2009 | Introduced. To print. |