|
09/08/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 93, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2787.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 1962.)
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 10).
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 823.)
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (April 1).
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (March 24).
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2009
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|