|
09/09/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 140, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2010
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Page 6717.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4825.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4714.)
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 4).
|
|
|
|
02/02/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Amended.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|