|
09/01/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 89, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1926.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1172.)
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From Consent Calendar. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (April 1).
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|