07/17/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 79, Statutes of 2009. | |||
07/17/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
07/09/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
07/09/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1663.) | |||
07/07/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
07/06/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 2392.) | |||
06/24/2009 | From Consent Calendar. To third reading. | |||
06/23/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (June 23). | |||
06/04/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
06/03/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended. | |||
04/30/2009 | Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |