05/20/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2009. | |||
05/20/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |||
05/14/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
05/14/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 900.) | |||
04/28/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/27/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1099.) | |||
04/16/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 16). | |||
04/01/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
03/31/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Amended. (Corrected April 1.) (Corrected April 3.) | |||
03/23/2009 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
03/05/2009 | From printer. | |||
03/04/2009 | Introduced. To print. |