07/17/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 80, Statutes of 2009. | |||
07/17/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
06/29/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
06/29/2009 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1521.) | |||
06/25/2009 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |||
06/24/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/23/2009 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
06/10/2009 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 9). | |||
05/14/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
05/04/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/04/2009 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1238.) | |||
04/23/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (April 22). | |||
04/14/2009 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |||
03/23/2009 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
03/06/2009 | From printer. | |||
03/05/2009 | Introduced. To print. |