|
09/16/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 98, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2009
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 2904.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2024.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1997.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Amended. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (May 12).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2009
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|