06/25/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 56, Statutes of 2009. | |||
06/25/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
06/22/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
06/22/2009 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1374.) | |||
05/21/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |||
05/13/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/11/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1362.) (Corrected May 12.) | |||
05/04/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |||
03/26/2009 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
03/18/2009 | From printer. | |||
03/17/2009 | Introduced. To print. |