08/27/2009 | Held under submission. | |||
08/17/2009 | In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file. | |||
07/20/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
07/08/2009 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 8). | |||
07/01/2009 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/18/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
06/02/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
06/01/2009 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 28. Page 1863.) | |||
05/29/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). | |||
05/13/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/12/2009 | Amended. | |||
05/11/2009 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 5). | |||
04/20/2009 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
04/02/2009 | From printer. | |||
04/01/2009 | Introduced. To print. |