08/25/2009 | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. | |||
08/19/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
08/18/2009 | From inactive file. To second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |||
05/14/2009 | To inactive file on motion of Senator Pavley. | |||
05/06/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |||
04/21/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/20/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 985.) | |||
04/16/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 16). | |||
04/15/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
04/14/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Amended. | |||
04/02/2009 | From printer. Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
04/01/2009 | Introduced. To print. |