LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR57
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR57
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR57
Compare Versions
ACR57 Chaptered May 20, 2009
ACR57 Enrolled May 18, 2009
ACR57 Amended April 23, 2009
ACR57 Amended April 16, 2009
ACR57 Introduced April 2, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
ACR57 Chaptered May 20, 2009
ACR57 Enrolled May 18, 2009
ACR57 Amended April 23, 2009
ACR57 Amended April 16, 2009
ACR57 Introduced April 2, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare