05/20/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 33, Statutes of 2009. | |||
05/20/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |||
05/14/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
05/14/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 900.) | |||
05/04/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/30/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1178.) | |||
04/29/2009 | Amended. To third reading. | |||
04/28/2009 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). | |||
04/16/2009 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
04/14/2009 | From printer. | |||
04/13/2009 | Introduced. To print. |