|
07/13/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 12:40 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2387.)
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1521.)
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1467.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|