09/01/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 90, Statutes of 2009. | |||
09/01/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
08/25/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/24/2009 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1926.) | |||
08/20/2009 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |||
08/17/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
07/23/2009 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
07/08/2009 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 7). | |||
06/11/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
05/28/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/28/2009 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1765.) | |||
05/21/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (May 20). | |||
05/12/2009 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 11). | |||
04/23/2009 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
04/17/2009 | From printer. | |||
04/16/2009 | Introduced. To print. |