|
09/01/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 91, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1926.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1765.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|