06/16/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 53, Statutes of 2009. | |||
06/16/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
06/11/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
06/11/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1268.) | |||
05/19/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/18/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1555.) | |||
05/14/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 14). | |||
04/30/2009 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
04/28/2009 | From printer. | |||
04/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |