05/10/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/06/2010 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5040.) | |||
05/04/2010 | Amended. To third reading. | |||
05/03/2010 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 3). | |||
04/22/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent. | |||
04/20/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. | |||
04/19/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Amended. | |||
05/04/2009 | Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. | |||
04/29/2009 | From printer. | |||
04/28/2009 | Introduced. To print. |