California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR67 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/04/2010

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 67AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 4, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 19, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Davis APRIL 28, 2009 Relative to Public Service Recognition  Month   Week  . LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 67, as amended, Davis. Public Service Recognition  Month.   Week.  This measure would designate the week of May 2 to May 8, 2010, as Public Service Recognition  Month   Week  , and encourage all Californians to recognize the crucial role of public employees in this state. Fiscal committee: no. WHEREAS, The contributions made by public employees in this state have strengthened our belief that public service is a noble profession; and WHEREAS, The professionalism and expertise demonstrated by public employees in this state in carrying out a wide variety of services have helped build a strong foundation for our government; and WHEREAS, Public employees have served the people of California well, even in difficult times; and WHEREAS, The State of California wishes to pay tribute to all public employees in the state for dedicating themselves to improving the quality of life for all of the people of California; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares the week of May 2 to May 8, 2010, as Public Service Recognition  Month   Week  , and encourages all Californians to recognize the crucial role of public employees in this state; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.