07/02/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 61, Statutes of 2009. | |||
07/02/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
06/26/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
06/26/2009 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1492.) | |||
06/25/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |||
01/22/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
01/15/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 185.) (Corrected January 26.) | |||
01/07/2009 | From printer. | |||
01/06/2009 | Introduced. To print. |