|
09/23/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 107, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2009
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3385.)
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2341.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2447.)
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (July 1).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|