07/17/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 81, Statutes of 2009. | |||
07/17/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
07/09/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
07/09/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1663.) | |||
06/25/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
06/24/2009 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2236.) | |||
06/22/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (June 22). | |||
05/11/2009 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
05/06/2009 | From printer. | |||
05/05/2009 | Introduced. To print. |