|
09/07/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 116, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2010
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Page 6638.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Passed on file.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4780.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Page 4417.)
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
02/24/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Amended.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (February 18).
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. (Page 3976.)
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Amended.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|