09/23/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 109, Statutes of 2009. | |||
09/23/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
09/12/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
09/10/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2390.) | |||
09/02/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
09/01/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 2848.) | |||
08/31/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). | |||
08/20/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
07/16/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
07/15/2009 | Amended. | |||
07/14/2009 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 7). | |||
06/08/2009 | Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. | |||
05/29/2009 | From printer. | |||
05/28/2009 | Introduced. To print. |