09/23/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 111, Statutes of 2009. | |||
09/23/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
09/10/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
09/09/2009 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2341.) | |||
09/08/2009 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |||
09/03/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |||
08/19/2009 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
07/13/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
07/13/2009 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2491.) | |||
07/08/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (July 8). | |||
06/29/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | |||
06/28/2009 | From Consent Calendar. To third reading. | |||
06/26/2009 | Amended. To Consent Calendar. | |||
06/25/2009 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (June 22). | |||
06/08/2009 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
06/04/2009 | From printer. | |||
06/03/2009 | Introduced. To print. |