04/16/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 13, Statutes of 2009. | |||
04/16/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
04/13/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
04/13/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 451.) | |||
03/26/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/26/2009 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 678.) | |||
03/23/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (March 23). | |||
02/05/2009 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
01/07/2009 | From printer. | |||
01/06/2009 | Introduced. To print. |