04/21/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2010. | |||
04/21/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
04/15/2010 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 46. Noes 11. Page 4684.) | |||
04/08/2010 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |||
04/08/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 7. Page 3118.) | |||
04/06/2010 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/05/2010 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 24). | |||
08/19/2009 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
07/14/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
07/13/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 2478.) | |||
07/09/2009 | Amended. To third reading. | |||
07/08/2009 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 1). | |||
06/17/2009 | From printer. | |||
06/16/2009 | Introduced. To print. |