09/16/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2009. | |||
09/16/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:30 a.m. | |||
09/03/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
09/02/2009 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 2120.) | |||
08/20/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |||
07/24/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
07/24/2009 | From printer. Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 2566.) | |||
07/23/2009 | Introduced. To print. |