09/23/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 112, Statutes of 2009. | |||
09/23/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
09/12/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
09/10/2009 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2378.) | |||
09/08/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |||
08/31/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
08/27/2009 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2759.) | |||
08/24/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (August 24). | |||
08/20/2009 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
07/27/2009 | From printer. | |||
07/24/2009 | Introduced. To print. |