08/17/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 84, Statutes of 2010. | |||
08/17/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
08/09/2010 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Page 6081.) | |||
07/01/2010 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |||
07/01/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4196.) | |||
06/17/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/16/2010 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 16). | |||
01/07/2010 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and RLS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
09/10/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
09/09/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3190.) | |||
09/01/2009 | Amended. To third reading. | |||
08/27/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 26). | |||
08/24/2009 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
08/18/2009 | From printer. | |||
08/17/2009 | Introduced. To print. |