09/23/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 113, Statutes of 2009. | |||
09/23/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
09/12/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
09/11/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 0. Page 2425.) | |||
09/10/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
09/09/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3214.) | |||
09/04/2009 | Read third time and amended. | |||
09/01/2009 | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/31/2009 | Amended. To Consent Calendar. | |||
08/27/2009 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (August 26). | |||
08/20/2009 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
08/18/2009 | From printer. | |||
08/17/2009 | Introduced. To print. |