03/27/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 7, Statutes of 2009. | |||
03/27/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
03/23/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
03/23/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 328.) | |||
01/27/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
01/26/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 233.) | |||
01/08/2009 | From printer. | |||
01/07/2009 | Introduced. To print. |