09/02/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
09/01/2009 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2849.) | |||
08/31/2009 | Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/27/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (August 27). | |||
08/26/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
08/25/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Amended. | |||
08/20/2009 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
08/19/2009 | From printer. | |||
08/18/2009 | Introduced. To print. |