09/23/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 115, Statutes of 2009. | |||
09/23/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
09/12/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
09/10/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2390.) | |||
09/08/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
09/08/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3095.) | |||
09/03/2009 | From printer. Referred to Com. on RULES. From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (September 3). | |||
09/02/2009 | Introduced. To print. |