09/23/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 117, Statutes of 2009. | |||
09/23/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
09/12/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
09/11/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2424.) | |||
09/11/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3359.) | |||
09/10/2009 | Referred to Com. on RULES. From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (September 10). | |||
09/09/2009 | From printer. | |||
09/08/2009 | Introduced. To print. |