02/11/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2010. | |||
02/11/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
02/08/2010 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Page 3990.) | |||
02/04/2010 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |||
02/04/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2763.) | |||
02/03/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/20/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
01/12/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
01/11/2010 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3747.) | |||
01/07/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 7). | |||
01/04/2010 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
09/11/2009 | From printer. | |||
09/10/2009 | Introduced. To print. |