07/02/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 64, Statutes of 2009. | |||
07/02/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
06/26/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
06/26/2009 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1492.) | |||
06/25/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |||
05/14/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/14/2009 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1472.) | |||
05/12/2009 | Amended. To Consent Calendar. | |||
05/11/2009 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (May 6). | |||
04/27/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |||
04/23/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Amended. | |||
04/22/2009 | In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author. | |||
02/05/2009 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |||
01/23/2009 | From printer. | |||
01/22/2009 | Introduced. To print. |