09/16/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 103, Statutes of 2009. | |||
09/16/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:30 a.m. | |||
09/08/2009 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 64. Noes 13. Page 3086.) | |||
09/02/2009 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |||
09/01/2009 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 2055.) | |||
08/25/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
08/24/2009 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |||
06/23/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22). | |||
06/11/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |||
05/19/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/18/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 13. Page 1536.) | |||
05/06/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 6). | |||
03/26/2009 | Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. | |||
03/10/2009 | From printer. | |||
03/09/2009 | Introduced. To print. |