06/16/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 52, Statutes of 2009. | |||
06/16/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
06/11/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
06/11/2009 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 0. Page 1268.) | |||
05/28/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |||
04/20/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/20/2009 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 1. Page 985.) | |||
04/16/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 16). | |||
04/15/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
04/13/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Amended. | |||
04/02/2009 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
03/26/2009 | From printer. | |||
03/25/2009 | Introduced. To print. |