California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AJR11 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 06/16/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AJR 11CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 52 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JUNE 16, 2009 ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 11, 2009 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 20, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 13, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Furutani MARCH 25, 2009 Relative to National Multicultural Cancer Awareness Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AJR 11, Furutani. National Multicultural Cancer Awareness Week. This measure would designate the week of April 19 to 25, 2009, inclusive, as "National Multicultural Cancer Awareness Week," and would encourage the promotion of policies and programs that seek to reduce cancer disparities and improve cancer prevention, detection, treatment, and followup care for all Californians. WHEREAS, National Multicultural Cancer Awareness Week has been observed across the country each year since 1987 to bring attention to the disparities of cancer among medically underserved populations; and WHEREAS, The American Cancer Society is participating in National Multicultural Cancer Awareness Week to point out the disparities in cancer burden and to encourage public and private sector commitments to helping eliminate these disparities; and WHEREAS, California is the most populous and ethnically and culturally diverse state in the country, and thus, in a position to provide leadership for the nation to address the reduction of the incidence of cancer among all races and genders; and WHEREAS, In California, disparities exist in knowledge about cancer, cancer survival, and access to early detection, high-quality treatment, health care coverage, and health care. Systemic inequities also exist, including differences in occupational hazards, environmental exposures to pollution and other toxins, access to education, nutrition, physical activity, safe neighborhoods, healthy foods, and other factors that contribute to an increased or reduced risk of cancer; and WHEREAS, The risk of developing and dying from cancer varies considerably among different cultural populations in California. The medically underserved are often diagnosed at later stages, and with a higher incidence of cancers with higher mortality, like lung cancer, and are more likely to receive lower quality health care; and WHEREAS, In California, African American males have the highest overall cancer incidence and mortality rates. African American women are more likely to die of breast cancer, although non-Hispanic white women are the most likely to be diagnosed with the disease. African Americans have substantially higher rates of cancers of the stomach, liver, larynx, myeloma, and Kaposi's sarcoma than non-Hispanic whites. African American men are at especially high risk for prostate cancer, more than any other racial and ethnic group; and WHEREAS, In California, Asian and Pacific Islanders are the only racial and ethnic group within which cancer is the leading cause of death. Lung cancer is the most common cancer among Laotian women, while breast cancer is the most common cancer among women of all racial and ethnic groups. Lung cancer is the most common cancer among Cambodian, Laotian, and Vietnamese men, while prostate cancer is the most common cancer for men in most ethnic groups. Asian and Pacific Islanders and Latinos have substantially higher rates of liver and stomach cancer than other groups. Cambodian, Laotian, and Vietnamese women have much higher rates of cervical cancer than non-Hispanic white women. Samoan and Tongan women have higher rates of cancers than non-Hispanic white women. Stomach and liver cancers are among the top five cancers in most Asian and Pacific Islander groups. Asian Americans have among the lowest rates of screening for breast, cervical, and colorectal cancers. A significant number of Korean Americans have never heard of the pap smear test. There remains a lack of data about factors related to cancer, cancer control, and effective interventions among Asian and Pacific Islanders; and WHEREAS, In California, Latinos have substantially higher rates of stomach and liver cancers than other Californians. Latinos have higher rates of acute lymphocytic leukemia, Kaposi's sarcoma, and cervical cancer than non-Hispanic whites. Cancer is the second leading cause of death for Latinos. Latinos have the highest likelihood of being uninsured. Latino women have the highest risk of developing cervical cancer, about twice as high as non-Hispanic white women, African American women, and Asian and Pacific Islander women; and WHEREAS, Members of the lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender community are at greater risk for cancer, face specific challenges accessing quality health care because of insurance policies that fail to cover same-sex partners, and may hesitate to access health care because of previous discrimination in health care settings. Lesbians have fewer mammograms, pelvic examinations, and pap smear tests than heterosexual women. There remains a lack of data about factors related to cancer, cancer control, and effective interventions in the lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender community; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly and the Senate of the State of California, jointly, That the Legislature declares the week of April 19 to 25, 2009, inclusive, as "National Multicultural Cancer Awareness Week," and encourages the promotion of policies and programs that seek to reduce cancer disparities and as a result, improve cancer prevention, detection, treatment, and followup care for all Californians; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the President and Vice President of the United States, to the Speaker of the House of Representatives, to the Majority Leader of the Senate, and to each Senator and Representative from California in the Congress of the United States.