|
08/23/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 101, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment. (Corrected August 16.)
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 4498.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 2476.)
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Amended.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|