09/14/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 164, Statutes of 2010. | |||
09/14/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | |||
08/30/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/25/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 8. Page 4864.) | |||
06/10/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 9). | |||
04/08/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
09/09/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
09/08/2009 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 29. Page 3108.) | |||
08/25/2009 | Amended. To third reading. | |||
08/24/2009 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (August 18). | |||
08/18/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
08/17/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended. | |||
04/20/2009 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/03/2009 | From printer. | |||
04/02/2009 | Introduced. To print. |