09/21/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 105, Statutes of 2009. | |||
09/21/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
09/09/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
09/08/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2296.) | |||
04/27/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/23/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1069.) | |||
04/21/2009 | Amended. To third reading. (Corrected April 22.) | |||
04/20/2009 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 20). | |||
04/16/2009 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
04/15/2009 | From printer. | |||
04/14/2009 | Introduced. To print. |